+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Hall
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2636
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Nelson
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Local Government
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor