+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 276
- Governor's action Approval
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presentment date
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 83-46)
- Third reading
- Amendments offered
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 14, 2014
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 62-0)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2751
- Received from Senate
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation and Public Safety
- Introduction and first reading