+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 93
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 93 05/06/16
- Governor's action Approval 05/06/16
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Governor approval 5/6/2016
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/06/16
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/03/16
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/03/16
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 2, 2016
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2652
- Received from Senate
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Author added Hoffman
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor