+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- HF substituted on General Orders HF1984
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation and Public Safety
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading