+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Bakk
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Gazelka
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading