+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Government Operations and Elections Policy
- Second reading
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF827
- Received from Senate
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- See SF1458, Art. 1, Sec. 125
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing
- Introduction and first reading