+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 08/01/19
- Chapter number 37
On August 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- See also First Special Session 2019, HF6, Art. 3, Sec. 11
- Effective date 08/01/19
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 37 05/17/2019
- Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/17/19
- Governor approval 05/17/19
- Presented to Governor 05/17/19
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 16, 2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1171
- Received from Senate
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading