+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- See SF2
- General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Finance
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Family Care and Aging
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor