+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Received from Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- See First Special Session 2019, SF12, Art. 8, Sec. 12
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor