+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- See HF2128, Art. 3, Sec. 28-29, 37-41
- pg. 4795
- pg. 4255
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 960
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 674
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 629
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading