+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 8/1/2013
- Chapter number 14
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapters 14 04/22/13
- Governor's action Approval 04/22/13
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Governor approval 04/22/13
- Secretary of State, Filed 04/22/13
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 04/18/13
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 04/18/13
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 131-0)
- Third reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 16, 2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 65-0)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 1181
- Received from Senate
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor