+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor