+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 20, 2013 in the Senate:
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- HF substituted in committee HF729
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Re-referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor