+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Author stricken Pederson
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Author added Pederson
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 47, returned to Judiciary
- Author added Hoffman
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Author stricken Ortman
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Author stricken Hall
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading