+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 8/1/2013
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 43
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 43 05/07/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/07/13
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Governor approval 05/07/13
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/7/2013
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/03/13
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 5/3/2013
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading (vote: 45-17)
- Senate concurred and repassed bill
- Returned from House with amendment
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 56-71)
- Motion to re-refer Rules and Legislative Administration
- Third reading as amended
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 79-47)
- Amended
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2013
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 662
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 45-20)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Commerce
- Comm report: Amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor