+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/13
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 87
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 87 05/24/13
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/24/2013
- Governor approval 5/24/2013
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/24/13
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/21/13
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/21/13
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed (vote: 63-0)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference (vote: 99-35)
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- House adopted conference committee report (vote: 93-40)
- Third reading as amended by Conference
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading (vote: 41-25)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Author added Bakk
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Champion; Hayden; Nelson
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Senate conferees Champion, Hayden, Nelson
- House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
- House conferees Hansen, Melin, and Kieffer.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House conferees Hansen; Melin; Kieffer
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Returned from House with amendment
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 100-31)
- Third reading as amended
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 25, 2013
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 62-0)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF568
- Received from Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Author added Marty
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Withdrawn
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor