+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- HF substituted on General Orders HF844
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Adopt previous comm report
- Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: No recommendation, re-referred to Finance
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor