+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter number 111
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 111 05/23/13
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/13
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/23/2013
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date Various Dates
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Governor approval 5/23/2013
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/22/13
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 5/22/2013
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed (vote: 38-27)
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference (vote: 78-53)
On May 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report (vote: 78-51)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 38-27)
- Senate adopted CC report (vote: 38-27)
- Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail (vote: 25-35)
- Taken from table
- Laid on table
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Author stricken Rosen
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Senate conferees Pappas, Reinert, Saxhaug
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- House conferees Murphy, M.; Nelson; and Davids.
- House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- House conferees Murphy, M.; Nelson; Davids
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Pappas; Reinert; Saxhaug
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Taken from table
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Returned from House with amendment
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments offered
- Bill was passed (vote: 75-53)
- Third reading
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 3, 2013
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended
- Second reading
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 48-12)
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Received from Senate
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading