+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 56
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/17
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 56 05/17/17
- Governor's action Approval 05/17/17
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor approval 5/17/2017
- Secretary of State, Filed 5/17/2017
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/15/17
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/15/17
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 11, 2017
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Author added Clausen
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF643
- Received from Senate
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor