+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- pg. 7950
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees Hansen, R.; Wazlawik; Morrison; Lippert; Heintzeman
- House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
- Senate conferees Ingebrigtsen; Tomassoni; Eichorn; Weber; Eken
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- pg. 7837
- pg. 7733
- pg. 7732
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Third reading as amended
- Bill was passed as amended
- Amended
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 28, 2022
- Second reading
On April 24, 2022 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- pg. 7435 vote: 37-29
- Special Order: Amended
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- pg. 6469
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor