+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Civil Law and Data Practices
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices
- Received from Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- See SF3, Art. 2, Sec. 1 (First Special Session)
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Introduction and first reading