+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 16, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter number 86
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/16/2020
- Governor approval 05/16/2020
On May 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 86 05/16/2020
- Secretary of State Chapter 86 05/16/2020
- Governor's action Approval 05/16/2020
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/14/2020
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 5/14/2020
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 13, 2020
On May 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3517
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Authors added Eichorn; Utke
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading