+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- See SF28, First Special Session 2020
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Amend previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended; re-refer to Finance
- Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
- Comm report: To pass
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading