+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 1, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter number 100
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/16
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 100 05/12/16
- Governor's action Approval 05/12/16
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor approval 5/12/2016
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/12/16
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/09/16
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/09/16
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 5, 2016
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2641
- Received from Senate
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce
- Introduction and first reading