+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter number 130
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/18
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 130 05/11/18
- Governor's action Approval 05/11/18
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Governor approval 05/11/18
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/11/18
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/08/18
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/08/18
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 07, 2018
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3536
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Author added Nelson
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading