+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (44)
On July 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 07/01/19
- Chapter number 39
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 07/01/19
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019
- Secretary of State Chapter 39 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/17/19
- Governor approval 05/17/19
- Presented to Governor 05/17/19
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- House adopted conference committee report
- Third reading as amended by Conference
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- House conferees Mann; Morrison; Munson
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed
- Senate conferees Jensen, Benson, and Klein
- House conferees Mann, Morrison, Munson
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Jensen; Benson; Klein
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- Returned from House with amendment
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 09, 2019
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Received from Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor