+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 242 05/13/14
- Governor's action Approval 05/13/14
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presentment date
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 123-0)
- Third reading
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 9, 2014
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2602
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 62-0)
- Special Order
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading