+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- HF substituted on General Orders HF2265
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation and Public Safety
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules and Administration
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor