+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on table
- Returned from House with amendment
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 132-0)
- Third reading as amended
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 24, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2664
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 64-0)
- Special Order
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading