+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 2778
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 734
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 699
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 464
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 385
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading