+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 164 04/11/14
- Governor's action Approval 04/11/14
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presentment date
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 127-0)
- Third reading
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, April 10, 2014
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2571
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 65-0)
- Special Order
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Energy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor