+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 229 05/09/14
- Governor's action Approval 05/09/14
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presentment date
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed (vote: 75-55)
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 56-74)
- Motion to re-refer Government Operations
- Third reading
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Amendments offered
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 7, 2014
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2613
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 50-17)
- Special Order
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor