+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 226
- pg. 226
- pg. 203
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 01/30/21
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter number 2
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 01/29/2021
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 01/29/2021
- Governor approval 01/29/2021
- Presented to Governor 01/29/2021
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
- Motion to suspend rules
- Motion prevailed
- Third reading
- Bill was passed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF135
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 168 vote: 66-0
- pg. 168
- pg. 165
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Received from Senate
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- pg. 125
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading
- Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy