+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date Sec. 1-2 08/01/14; Sec. 3 05/10/14; Sec. 4
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 232 05/09/14
- Governor's action Approval 05/09/14
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presentment date
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading (vote: 65-0)
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 130-0)
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred and repassed bill
- Returned from House with amendment
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 7, 2014
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 5, 2014
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 65-0)
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2307
- Received from Senate
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Author added Marty
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor