+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- HF substituted on General Orders HF263
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Author added Kent
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary
- Introduction and first reading