+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce action recurred
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to lay previous motion on the table
- Motion to suspend rules
- Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce
- Received from Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- See SF1692
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading