+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 08/01/19
- Chapter number 35
On August 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/19
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 35 05/17/2019
- Governor's action Approval 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/17/2019
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/17/19
- Governor approval 05/17/19
- Presented to Governor 05/17/19
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 16, 2019
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1408
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading