+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 247
- Governor's action Approval
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presentment date
- Returned from House
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Amendments offered
- Bill was passed (vote: 76-53)
- Third reading
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 12, 2014
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2324
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed (vote: 49-13)
- Special Order
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education
- Introduction and first reading