+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Received from Senate
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Authors added Sparks; Saxhaug; Dziedzic
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Introduction and first reading