+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 1, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 81
On August 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/17
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 81 05/23/17
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/23/17
- Governor approval 05/23/17
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 05/23/17
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/20/17
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/20/17
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 19, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Received from Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor