+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 2, 2016
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Commerce and Regulatory Reform
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 07, 2015
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2009
- Received from Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce
- Introduction and first reading