+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- See First Special Session 2021, HF63, Art. 3, Sec. 1
- pg. 1206
- Joint rule 2.03 Suspended
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 1075
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 846
- pg. 825
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- pg. 704
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy
- Introduction and first reading