+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 08/01/2015
- Chapter number 26
On August 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 08/01/15
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 26 05/14/15
- Governor's action Approval 05/14/15
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Governor approval 05/14/15
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/14/15
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/11/15
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/11/15
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from House
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 07, 2015
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1538
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to State and Local Government
- Introduction and first reading