+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Chapter number 115
- Secretary of State, Filed 05/27/2020
- Governor approval 05/27/2020
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date Various Dates
- Secretary of State Chapter 115 05/27/2020
- Governor's action Approval 05/27/2020
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 05/18/2020
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 05/18/2020
On May 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Author stricken Anderson, P.
- Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Draheim
- Chief author added Benson
- Returned from House with amendment
- Senate concurred and repassed bill
On May 17, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to recall
- Motion prevailed
- Motion to suspend rules
- Motion prevailed
- Rules suspended, urgency declared
- Second reading
- Amended
- Third reading as amended
- Bill was passed as amended
On May 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
- Received from Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order: Amended
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author added Housley
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author added Klein
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading