+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- See First Special Session 2019, HF2, Art. 11, Sec. 2, 4-5, 14
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Energy and Climate Finance and Policy Division
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading Passed
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Senate file first reading, referred to Ways and Means
- Received from Senate
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Order
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Author added Rosen
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor