+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (48)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 2
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 01/26/17
- House adopted SCC report and repassed bill
- See also First Special Session, SF2, Art. 5, Sec. 8-9
- Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/26/17
- Effective date Various Dates
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report
- Motion to reject CC report, did not prevail
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill vote: 46-20
- Presentment date 01/26/17
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- Motion to return bill to conference committee
- Motion did not prevail
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference
- Presented to Governor 01/26/17
- Governor approval 01/26/17
- Secretary of State, Filed 01/26/17
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- House adopted conference committee report - question recurred.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees Benson; Abeler; Dahms; Jensen; Franzen
- Returned from House with amendment
- Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed
- Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested
- House conferees Hoppe; Davids; Dean, M; Fabian; Halverson.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House conferees Hoppe; Davids; Dean M.; Fabian; Halverson
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate conferees Benson, Abeler, Dahms, Jensen, Franzen
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, January 19, 2017
- Bill was passed as amended
- Third reading as amended
- Point of order raised, ruled well taken
- Amended
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
- Second reading
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading
- Special Order
- Bill passed
- Motion did not prevail To refer to Taxes
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate
- Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF1
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading
- Comm report: To pass as amended
- Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
- Introduction and first reading
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor