+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Brand
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Authors added Bahner, Albright, and Theis
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Dehn
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor