+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- See First Special Session HF6 Article 3, Sec. 76
- Author added Mariani
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Division action, return to Ways and Means
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Masin
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by Chair to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Bernardy
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Author added Kunesh-Podein
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor