+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- See Senate file in House SF562
- Authors added Clark and Loeffler.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- HF indefinitely postponed
- Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF562
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt as amended
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Maye Quade.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform