+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Howe
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Nornes
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Authors added Quam; Ward, J.E.; and Johnson, C.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor